Aguayo-Becerra v. Ash Grove Cement Company et al
Plaintiff: Salome Aguayo-Becerra
Defendant: Ash Grove Cement Company, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 11 and John Doe 12
Case Number: 2:2015cv01561
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Defendant's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed 76 Motion to Dismiss Parties. Defendants Goodman Conveyor Company and TPI Engineered Systems, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice.The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to change the case caption to reflect the only remaining defendant as FLSmidth, Inc. Cement Projects Americas. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying Ash Grove Cement Company's 78 Motion to quash subpoenas. The discovery cut-off deadline is extended to 10/18/2017 for the limited purpose of deposing Michael Begley. All other dates established by this Court's March 14, 2017 Minute Entry (Dkt. No. 70 ) remain unchanged. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting defendant TPI Engineered Systems Inc's 72 Motion to file an amended answer within 14 days by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER dismissing the following Defendants without prejudice for failure to prosecute: Joy Global, Inc.; Continental Conveyor & Equipment Co.; Transmission Products, Inc.; N.E.S. Investment Co.; John Doe 11; and John Doe 12; re 69 Order to Show Cause. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant TPE Engineered Systems Inc.'s 64 Motion to Continue Trial. Jury Trial is continued to 1/29/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Plaintiff is ordered to SHOW CAUSE why the C ourt should not dismiss the claims against those Defendants who have not appeared-or have not been identified-for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due within 14 days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 56 stipulated motion to dismiss without prejudice claims against Defendants FLSmidth A/S and FLSmidth USA Inc Mineral Processing. FLSmidth Inc. remains as the only FLSmidth-entity-related defendant. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguayo-Becerra v. Ash Grove Cement Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salome Aguayo-Becerra
Represented By: Robert D Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ash Grove Cement Company
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Kelly H Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?