Microsoft Corporation v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2015cv01605
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part Parties' 59 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Reply Brief. The Court will extend the Reply deadline to Friday, 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re Parties' 52 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file its response an additional 32 days, up to and including 7/22/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Defendant's 49 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief. The IRS may file a motion for summary judgment not to exceed 29 pages. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 47 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The remaining deadline for the filing of IRS's motion for summary judgment is extended up to and including 4/29/2022. This will be the last extension. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Parties' 44 Fifth Unopposed Motion Regarding Case Schedule. The remaining deadline for the filing of IRS's motion for summary judgment is extended up to and including 3/29/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re Defendant's 42 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing a motion for summary judgment is extended up to and including 1/28/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Parties' 40 Third Consent Motion Regarding Case Schedule. The IRS to provide draft revised Vaughn indices by 10/15/2021. The IRS to file its motion for summary judgment by 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting the parties' 36 Second Consent Motion Regarding Case Schedule. The IRS to provide draft revised Vaughn indices by 9/17/2021. The IRS to file its motion for summary judgment by 10/29/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting the parties' 34 Consent Motion Regarding Case Schedule. The IRS to provide draft revised declarations by 6/24/2021. The IRS to provide draft revised Vaughn indices by 8/13/2021. The IRS to file its motion for summary judgment by 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting the parties' 32 Joint Motion to Extend Time Regarding Case Schedule. The IRS to provide draft revised declarations: June 15, 2021; The IRS to provide draft revised Vaughn indices: August 13, 2021; The IRS to file its motion for summary judgment: September 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE ORDER 30 Joint Status Report. The following schedule is adopted: Defendant to provide declaration(s) concerning the adequacy of its search to the Plaintiff by 8/31/2020; Defendant to co mplete Vaughn index and provide to the Plaintiff by 11/30/2020; Plaintiff to complete list of challenges to Defendant's exemption claims on records withheld in part and provide to Defendant by 11/30/2020; Plaintiff to identify any remaining outstanding issues requiring briefing to Defendant by 2/14/2021; Defendant's motions for summary judgment (or stipulated dismissals) filed with the Courtby 3/31/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: James M. O'Brien
Represented By: Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky
Represented By: Daniel A Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?