Holden Manor Homeowners Association v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Holden Manor Homeowners Association
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2015cv01676
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Stipulated motion to dismiss. Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of America are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Defendants Safeco and Liberty Mutual. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER dismissing with prejudice Defendant Granite State Insurance Company per 57 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER re 55 Notice of Occurrence of Alternate Dispute Resolution. Parties are directed to submit dismissal paperwork within 30 days. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Allstate Insurance Company per 53 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour denying Defendants' 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holden Manor Homeowners Association v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holden Manor Homeowners Association
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Represented By: Michael K McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Represented By: Michael K McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?