Durant v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brett Durant
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv01710
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT granting Plaintiff's 113 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Incentive Award; Plaintiff's 122 MOTION for Judgment & Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 119 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs re Final Class Settlement Approval signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 111 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Leave to File and Over-length Briefs signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 86 Amended Motion to Approve Class Notice; granting Defendant's 89 Motion to Stay; and granting Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Appoint Mr. Nauheim as class counsel. Defendant must produce the updated list of potential class members to Plaintiff within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Furthermore, any dispositive motion deadlines are stayed pending the Washington Supreme Court's determinations with regard to the certified questions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Class Definition signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying defendant's 53 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying defendant's 65 Motion to strike; granting plaintiff's 67 Motion to certify questions to the WA Supreme Court. Parties to file a stipulation within 45 days re agreed upon narrower language for the class definition signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel. The Court denies State Farm's motion to strike. Dkt. # 34 . The Court requests briefing from the parties within ten (10) days from the date of this Order regarding whether certain questions should be certified to the Washington Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durant v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David Dworsky(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Frank Falzetta(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer M Hoffman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory S Worden
Represented By: Laura Hawes Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Durant
Represented By: Tyler K Firkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?