Lyles v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Lyles
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv01716
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER dismissing action with prejudice per 30 Stipulation and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A). Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER per 28 notice of settlement, parties directed to submit dismissal paperwork within 30 days. Clerk directed to terminate Defendant's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER setting the following deadlines: Proposed pretrial order, trial briefs and motions in limine due by 7/24/2017; responses or objections due by 7/28/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 18 Second Stipulated Motion to Amend Trial Date and Case Schedule. Deadlines AMENDED as follows: 39.1 ADR requirement to be completed by 7/28/2017, Discovery completed by 5/26/2017, Dispositive motions due by 6/23/2017, Jury Trial is set for 8/7/2017 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyles v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Lyles
Represented By: Mark K Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Pamela Salgado
Represented By: Aisha Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?