State Farm Fire and Casualty v. Helen of Troy, Limited et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty
Defendant: Helen of Troy Limited, Helen of Troy Liability Company, Helen of Troy Limited Corporation, Helen of Troy L.P., Kaz USA Incorporated and Kaz Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv01771
Filed: November 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 81 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Defendants' 86 Motion for Relief from the Court's Order on Motions in Limine. Plaintiff's Motions in Limine are GRANTED, DENIED, AND DEFERRED as stated in this order. Defendants' Motions in Limine remain undisturbed. This Order amends the Court's prior Order (Dkt. # 85 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying defendants' 93 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE granting in part and denying in part and deferring in part 70 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part and deferring in part 73 Motion in Limine signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 58 MOTION for Sanctions And Exclusion of Weiss filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 58 Motion to Exclude John Weiss and for Sanctions; supplemental briefing due within 7 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying defendants' 56 Motion to Continue Trial Date by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Compel. Defendants to fully and completely answer State Farms First Set of Discovery no later than the close of business on January 6, 2017. by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MKB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty v. Helen of Troy, Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy Limited
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy Liability Company
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy Limited Corporation
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy L.P.
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaz USA Incorporated
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaz Incorporated
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty
Represented By: Craig Evezich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?