Nautica Condominium Owners Associaiton v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nautica Condominium Owners Association
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy Nos EQ032763, EQ032764, and 46-7500057326-S-00, Hartford Fire Insurance Co. and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2015cv01788
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. It is Ordered that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), all claims against Defendants Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and RLI Insurance Company, as well as all counterclaims, are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. (PM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL of all claims with prejudice against and by Defendant Commonwealth Insurance Company of America Inc. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting Defendant Discovery and Plaintiff Nautica's 75 Motion for a Contribution Bar Order and Dismissal of All Claims Against Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company; All claims against Discover are DISMISSED with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT) (Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company terminated.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of all Claims Against Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing action with prejudice and without costs against Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims against defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Co. by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to 5/8/2017 for Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company to answer Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER setting an in-court Status Conference for 4/18/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Counsel for all parties in the consolidated action directed to appear. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS granting 30 STIPULATED MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; cases C17-82RSM and C16-1983RSM are consolidated into C15-1788RSM by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautica Condominium Owners Associaiton v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautica Condominium Owners Association
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: William F Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy Nos EQ032763, EQ032764, and 46-7500057326-S-00
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Matthew J Sekits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Co.
Represented By: Matthew S Adams
Represented By: Jillian M Hinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?