Michael Kantor et al v. BigTip, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kantor, SLM Holdings Limited LLC, 3 Wise Ventures, Inc. and Cabbage Tree Investments, LLC
Defendant: BigTip, Inc., Whotoo, Inc., George Bremer, Matt Rowlen and Demandbase, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01871
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part Plaintiffs' 210 Motions in Limine; granting in part, denying in part and reserving in part Defendants BigTip, Inc., WhoToo Inc., Demandbase Inc., and Matt Rowland's 208 Joint Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting Defendant Demandbase, Inc.'s 139 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims against Demandbase, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying Defendants' 191 192 Motions for Leave to File Overlength Reply Briefs. Defendants must file reply briefs in conformity with the length requirements of the Local Rules by February 2, 2017 at 12 noon. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 157 Motion to Amend the Case Schedule. The deadline for Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' dispositive motions will be extended to January 24, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply briefing will be due on January 29, 2018. Defendants' dispositive motions 139 144 146 and 150 are re-noted for 1/29/2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting Defendants WhoToo Inc, and Matt Mowlen's 145 Motion to Seal Documents in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment. The exhibits filed as Dkt. ## 151 and 152 shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting Defendant's 138 Motion for Leave to File Joint Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying parties' 128 Stipulated Motion for Order Granting to Extend Discovery Deadline. The request to revise the existing case schedule is DENIED without prejudice to bring a renewed motion which cures the defects noted above and outlines a plan for meeting the revised deadlines. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Defendants BigTip, Inc., Matt Rowlen's 125 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)(Added attorney Hozaifa Y Cassubhai for BigTip, Inc. and Matt Rowlen)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 124 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Demandbase,Inc., signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (Added attorney Benjamin I VandenBerghe, Nathaniel Hedberg Somers for Demandbase, Inc.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant George Bremer From This Action With Prejudice by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (lp)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying Defendants WhoToo, Inc. and Matthew Rowlen's 86 Motion to Compel Production from Plaintiffs and Compliance of Elisha Gilboa with Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 71 Motion to amend the complaint; the second amended complaint shall be filed within 10 days signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Kantor et al v. BigTip, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kantor
Represented By: Paul William Chandler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLM Holdings Limited LLC
Represented By: Paul William Chandler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3 Wise Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Paul William Chandler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabbage Tree Investments, LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BigTip, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew N Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whotoo, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Represented By: James M Grady
Represented By: Brittany L McCarthy
Represented By: Andrew N Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Rowlen
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Represented By: Andrew N Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demandbase, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew N Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?