Estate of Kim Ha Ram et al v. Ride the Ducks of Seattle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Kim Ha Ram, Kim Soon Wan and Jeong Ju Hee
Defendant: Ride the Ducks of Seattle, LLC and Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01929
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' 66 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss; This action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying 64 Stipulated Motion to remand by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 62 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Added attorney Karen Kathryn Koehler, Andrew N. Ackley for plaintiffs. Attorney David L. Broom and William C Schroeder terminated.)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The court STRIKES the hearing set for 10/27/2016. Defendant Ride the Ducks of Seattle, LLC's Rule 12(c) motion for partial judgment on the pleadings, docket no. 26 , as joined by Ride the Ducks International, LLC, docket no. 29 , is GRANTED, and the claims against both Ride the Ducks/Seattle and RTDI under Washington law for wrongful death, non-pecuniary damages in connection with the "survival" action, and outrage (intentional infliction of emotional distress) are DISMISSED with prejudice. (AD)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Pursuant to Rule 5.1(b) and 28 U.S.C. § 2403, the Court hereby certifies to the Washington State Attorney General that a constitutional challenge to a state statute has been presented in this case. The Attorney General may intervene in this matter within 60 days after the notice is filed or after the Court certifies the challenge, whichever is earlier. Pursuant to Rule 5.1(c), the Court may reject the constitutional challenge before the time to intervene expires. (AD) cc: WA State Attorney General
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Kim Ha Ram et al v. Ride the Ducks of Seattle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Kim Ha Ram
Represented By: Geoffrey Franklin Palachuk
Represented By: Anne Schroeder
Represented By: William C Schroeder
Represented By: William John Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Soon Wan
Represented By: Geoffrey Franklin Palachuk
Represented By: Anne Schroeder
Represented By: William C Schroeder
Represented By: William John Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeong Ju Hee
Represented By: Geoffrey Franklin Palachuk
Represented By: Anne Schroeder
Represented By: William C Schroeder
Represented By: William John Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks of Seattle, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Represented By: Joseph P Derrig
Represented By: Duncan K Fobes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Angela Hunt
Represented By: Daniel R Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Scott Channing Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?