Allstate Insurance Co. et al v. Lighthouse Law P.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Co., Allstate Indemnity Co., Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Lighthouse Law P.S., Inc., Chong Joseph Kim, Jane Doe Kim, Patty Thammalaiviroj, John Doe Thammalaiviroj and Does 1-75
Case Number: 2:2015cv01976
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting defendants' 114 Motion to Vacate Entries of Default and Default Judgment entered against Seok Bae Mike Seo, Lee Ok Mi, and Hanna & Dooree Corporation; VACATING Clerk's 84 Entry of Default and 108 Default Judgment; Defendant shall file an answer within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within five days of the date of this Order, why they should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Local Rule 10(e)(9), as to defendants, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 105 MOTION for Default Judgment, (Motions terminated: 110 MOTION Clarification/Nunc Pro Tunc Re Rate of Interest Applied to Default Judgment); by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 105 Motion for Default Judgment, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. ORDERED that default judgment is entered against Seok Bae Mike Seo, Lee Ok Mi, and Hanna & Dooree Corporation in the amount of $91,712.57 in damages, plus attorney's fees and costs of $19,485, for a total amount owing of $111,197.57. (SWT)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 71 Motion to Compel and granting Defendants' 85 Motion to Quash Subpoena, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS 56 59 TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; plaintiffs may amend complaint within 21 days or judgment will be entered by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(CDA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Co. et al v. Lighthouse Law P.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jean Y. Kang
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Jean Y. Kang
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jean Y. Kang
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jean Y. Kang
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Law P.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong Joseph Kim
Represented By: Gregory Paul Turner
Represented By: Joel E. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Kim
Represented By: Gregory Paul Turner
Represented By: Joel E. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Thammalaiviroj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Thammalaiviroj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?