Ride the Ducks International, LLC v. T.H.E. Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Defendant: T.H.E. Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: T.H.E. Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01982
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER: The Court declines to take any action at this time, and this matter remains stayed pending further order. The parties shall file another joint status report on or before 12/31/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER regarding parties' 78 Status Report. The Court declines to take any action, and this matter remains stayed pending further order. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report within six (6) months of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file another Joint Status Report within ninety (90) days of the date of this Minute Order concerning whether the parties have executed a final settlement agreement and, if so, whether this case can be dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order. Failure to comply with this Minute Order may be grounds for dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 69 Stipulated Motion to stay ; striking without prejudice cross-motions for summary judgment, docket nos. 55 and 62 ; striking without prejudice T.H.E. Insurance Company's 44 Motion for Joinder ; parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after the underlying litigation resolves or by 9/28/2018, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER RENOTING to 5/26/2017 Plaintiff Ride the Ducks International's 69 Stipulated MOTION to Stay; RENOTING to 6/9/2017 Defendant T.H.E. Insurance Company's 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Defendant T.H.E. Insurance Company's 44 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties, Plaintiff Ride the Ducks International's 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding T.H.E. Insurance Company's Duty to Defend. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 67 Stipulated Motion; RENOTING Defendant T.H.E. Insurance Companys 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Defendant T.H.E. Insurance Company's 44 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties, Plaintiff Ride the Ducks International's 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Noting Date 5/19/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendant T.H.E. Insurance Company's 44 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties; Noting Date 5/12/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Ride the Ducks International, LLC's 52 Motion for leave to file multiple dispositive motions or, in the alternative, an overlength dispositive motion. The motion for leave to file mu ltiple dispositive motions is DENIED; the motion for leave to file an over length dispositive motion concerning T.H.E. Insurance Company's duty, if any, to defend Ride the Ducks International, LLC (RTDI) is GRANTED in part. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ride the Ducks International, LLC v. T.H.E. Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Represented By: James L. Robenalt
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.H.E. Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory S Worden
Represented By: Laura Hawes Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: T.H.E. Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory S Worden
Represented By: Laura Hawes Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Represented By: James L. Robenalt
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?