United States of America, Ex rel. Raju A.T. Dahlstrom et al v. Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe of Washington et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, State of Washington and Raju A.T. Dahlstrom
Defendant: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe of Washington, Community Natural Medicine, PLLC, Christine Marie Jody Morlock, Robert Larry Morlock and Ronda Kay Metcalf
Case Number: 2:2016cv00052
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ON RESPONSES TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SEEK LEGAL COUNSEL. The court concludes that it should enter a Rule 54(b) judgment in favor of Defendants on Mr. Dahlstrom's comp laint and in favor of Individual Defendants with respect to the court's award of attorney's fees against Mr. Pope and hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to do so. In addition, the court DENIES Mr. Dahlstrom's motion for an extension of time to obtain legal counsel (Dkt. # 122 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiff Raju A.T. Dahlstrom via USPS
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying Mr. Dahlstrom's 116 "Request for Further Instructions from the Court." Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff Raju A.T. Dahlstrom via USPS)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying Attorney Richard Pope's 106 Motion for reconsideration in part of the court's order directing him to pay Defendants' reasonable attorney's fees of $10,753.74. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 2/5/2020: cc to Raju Dahlstrom via USPS (PM).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER directing Defendants to respond to Attorney Richard L. Pope, Jr.'s 106 MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due 12/16/2019, Reply due 12/20/2019. MOTION for Reconsideration is re-noted for 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING THE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY, THE PARTIES' RESPONSES TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND CERTAIN MOTIONS signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Plaintiff's counsel's 80 Motion for Relief from Deadline to Respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's counsel shall respond to the court's order to show cause and Defendants' response to the court's order to show cause, if any, no later than 9/26/2019. Defendants shall file their response to the court's order to show cause, if any, no later than 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Individual Defendants' 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Mr. Dahlstroms' complaint with prejudice; directing Mr. Dahlstrom's counsel to, within 14 days, SHOW CAUSE why the court should not apportion part of its award of fees against him personally; denying Individual Defendants' 77 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Relator Raju A.T. Dahlstrom's 68 Motion to extend the noting date of Individual Defendants' summary judgment motion 64 . Mr. Dahlstrom's responsive memorandum due 7/8/2019; Individual Defendants' rely memorandum due 7/17/2019. Individual Defendants' 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment is renoted for 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date. The Court grants the Parties' Motion and orders the trial date continued to the end of its trial calendar. Clerk shall issue new case schedule. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying parties' 59 Stipulated Motion to Extend Trial Date. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying Defendants Ronda Metcalf, Christine Morlock, and Robert Morlock's 56 Motion to Compel Discovery without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 48 50 Responses to Order to Show Cause; court cautions parties that further failure to adhere to the court's orders may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER directing parties to respond to the 45 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SHOW CAUSE MINUTE ORDER - Counsel ordered to show cause by July 24, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for failing to file a Joint Status Report. (AD)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Stipulated motion for amended order re: initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/15/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 6/22/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 13 Motion to dismiss. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 13 ) with respect to Mr. Dahlstrom's claims against the Sauk-Suiattle, but DENIES the motion with re spect to Mr. Dahlstrom's claims against CNM, Dr. Morlock, Mr. Morlock, and Ms. Metcalf. The court DISMISSES Mr. Dahlstrom's claims against the Tribe with prejudice and without leave to amend because these claims fail as a matter of law. Finally, the court declines Defendants' request to award Rule 11 sanctions and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Sauk-Suiattle's 15 Motion for TRO; denying Sauk-Suiattle's 16 Motion to Expedite Hearing by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, Ex rel. Raju A.T. Dahlstrom et al v. Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kayla Stahman(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Carrie L Bashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raju A.T. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe of Washington
Represented By: Jack Warren Fiander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Natural Medicine, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Marie Jody Morlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Larry Morlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Kay Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?