Snohomish County v. Allied World National Assurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Snohomish County
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company, Arrowood Indemnity Company, Berkley National Insurance Company, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Wisconsin, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Insurance Company of the West, Lexington Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00063
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 259 Stipulation. All claims between Snohomish County and the Defendant Insurers arising from the County's claims for insurance coverage for the Oso I and Oso II are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SWT)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Defendants Allied World National Assurance Company, Berkley National Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company of Wisconsin, National Casualty Company, and The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company per 242 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting Defendant Lexington Insurance Company's 205 Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SWT) (Lexington Insurance Company as defendant terminated.)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying Defendant The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania's 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SWT)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The three pending motions for summary judgment brought by the County, ICSOP, and Lexington shall not be stayed 198 202 205 . The parties will provide the Court with a periodic joint report on the status of the Underlying Litigation; the status reports are to be filed every 120 days from the date of this order. The parties are to notify the Court within 7 days of any event or events which render this stay no longer necessary. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snohomish County v. Allied World National Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snohomish County
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Joseph B. Genster
Represented By: Michael C Held
Represented By: Haley K. Krug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eliot M Harris
Represented By: Alexander E Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the West
Represented By: David Stephen Cottnair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Justin Sean Landreth
Represented By: Peter J Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Kay
Represented By: Michael Alexander Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?