City of Seattle v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc, Pharmacia Corporation and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2016cv00107
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 139 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Stipulated Motion and Order Amending Trial Date and Related Dates: Jury Trial is set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Length of trial: 3 to 12 weeks, Fact discovery completed by 5/14/2021 , Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/18/2021, Expert discovery completed by 9/3/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 10/7/2021, Motions in Limine due by 12/2/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/28/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/11/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 2/11/2022, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending stay of case re Parties' 153 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay re parties' 151 Stipulated Motion signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Amended ORDER granting Defendant Monstanto Company's 118 Motion to Compel Response to Monsanto Company's Special Interrogatories and Requests for Production: Plaintiff is ORDERED to produce the requested documents by its second self-imposed deadline of 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re Parties' 123 Stipulated Motion: Defendants' 118 MOTION to Compel renoted for 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 95 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time re parties' 96 Stipulated Motion; RENOTING Plaintiff's 92 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counter-Claims and to Strike Certain Defenses : Noting Date 11/10/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting Defendants' 76 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Counterclaims. Monsanto's proposed "First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Counterclaims," attached as Exhibit A, Dkt. # 76 -2, is hereby entered and incorporated into the record of this matter. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 82 , 83 Stipulated Motion for Relief from a Deadline and Leave to File Over-Length Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Defendants' 73 Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting parties' 64 Stipulated Joint Motion for Extension of Time; deadline for Plaintiff to file a responsive pleading to the Defendants' Counterclaims is EXTENDED to 4/28/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff City of Seattle's First Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Deadline extended to March 24, 2017. (KERR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Seattle's claims for defective design, failure to warn, and equitable indemnity are hereby dismissed. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Seattle v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: John Paul Fiske(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John H. Gomez(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Peter Samuel Holmes
Represented By: Laura B Wishik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?