McGlothin v. CTI BioPharma Corp et al
Plaintiff: Darron McGlothin
Defendant: CTI BioPharma Corp, James A Bianco and Louis A Bianco
Case Number: 2:2016cv00216
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Approving Distribution Plan re plaintiff's 121 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES re Lead Plaintiff's 109 MOTION for Final Approval of the Proposed Settlement, the Plan of Allocation, and Lead Counsel's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (see order for details) (PM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Leave to File Motion Exceeding Page Limits re parties' 108 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice re parties' 103 Stipulated Motion ; Settlement Hearing set for 2/1/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15106, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Stay of Proceedings re parties' 101 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPOINTING DAFNA AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVING BERNSTEIN LITOWITZ AS LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court GRANTS DAFNA LifeScience, LP and DAFNA LifeScience Select's motion (Dkt. # 8 ) and DENIES Medical Opportunities Fund's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel (Dkt. # 32 ). Parties to meet and confer and file a joint status report no later than Monday, 9/26/2016. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlothin v. CTI BioPharma Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darron McGlothin
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTI BioPharma Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis A Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?