Stroh v. Saturna Capital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gordon Scott Stroh
Defendant: Saturna Capital Corporation, Nicholas Kaiser, Deborah Kaiser, Jane Carten and Terrence Carten
Case Number: 2:2016cv00283
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE ORDER denying defendants' 222 Motion for Reconsideration. The date for release of transcript restriction for Days 1-7 of trial (June 16 26, 2017) is RESET to February 16, 2017. The transcripts for Days 8 & 9 (June 27 & 28, 2017), as to which defendants have proposed no redaction, may be released immediately. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Court Reporter Andrea Ramirez)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTE ORDER to RENOTE defendants' 222 MOTION for Reconsideration : Noting Date 12/22/2017; Trial transcripts, dkt. 206-214, shall remain under seal until further order of the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Court Reporter Andrea Ramirez)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 219 Motion for Redaction; re 206 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, 207 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, 212 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 216 Motion for Redaction; re 163 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, 204 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Court reporters via email)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER committing jury to the custody of a duly sworn bailiff ; ordering the Clerk, U.S. District Court, pay for the meals of said jurors at the expense of the United States Courts, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER denying in part and deferring in part Plaintiff's 125 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; granting in part, denying in part, striking in part and deferring in part Defendants' 122 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part defendants' objections to portions of the video deposition testimony of plaintiff's witness; re 138 Proposed Pretrial Order and 145 Praecipe. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER striking hearing concerning motions in limine scheduled for 6/2/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall instead be prepared to address any pending motions in limine at the Pretrial Conference scheduled for 6/9/2017, at 10:00 a.m. In response to plaintiff's motions in limine, defendants for the first time raise arguments concerning the scope of protection afforded by the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002 and the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act of 2010. Plaintiff to f ile suppl. brief on these issues by 9:00 a.m. on 6/6/2017. Also by 9:00 a.m. on 6/6/2017, defendants shall file a supplemental brief addressing why they did not present these issues earlier and why they failed to file their response to plaintiff's motions in limine and supporting materials under seal as directed by the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 120 Motion to Seal, (Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Max Hensley, docket no. 121 , shall remain under seal) ; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 124 Motion to Seal, (All papers filed in docket nos. 127 , 127-1, 127-2, 127-3, 127-4, and 127-5 shall remain under seal). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER directing all exhibits to the Wells Declaration, docket nos. 107 -1 & 108 , shall remain under seal ; striking as moot Plaintiff's 104 Motion to Seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER denying defendants' 99 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 98 MOTION to Seal, (Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brendan T. Mangan, docket no. 102 , shall remain under seal); MINUTE ORDER denying in part, deferring in part, and RENOTING to 5/12/2017 Plaintiff's 104 MOTION to Seal; MINUTE ORDER directing parties to SHOW CAUSE by 5/12/2017, why Exhibits A, B, D-H, J-N, P-AI, AK-AP, AR-BA, BD-BE, and BI-BJ to the Wells Declaration, docket no. 108 , should not be unsealed. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 96 Stipulated Motion on Briefing Schedule, any dispositive motion remains due on March 30, 2017, but it shall be noted for the fifth Friday after filing. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly granting 93 stipulated motion to extend the expert disclosure deadline to 1/25/2017. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroh v. Saturna Capital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Scott Stroh
Represented By: Christopher Brian Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saturna Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Carten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Carten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?