Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc v. Honeywell International Inc
Plaintiff: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv00341
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims. Time extended to 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying Defendant's 82 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying Plaintiff Intellicheck Mobilisa's 59 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; denying Defendant Honeywell International's 66 Second Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting parties' 75 Consent Motion for Defendant to File an Over-Length Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff to file an over-length Opposition. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(TH)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must file its second amended complaint not later than seven (7) days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Stipulated Motion to reschedule the Markman hearing. Markman Hearing is CONTINUED to 12/15/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 55 Stipulated Motion; Deadline for Honeywell's Non-infringement and Invalidity Contentions extended to 7/14/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc v. Honeywell International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellicheck Mobilisa, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Byer
Represented By: Amber N Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Terry M Sanks(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?