Milutinovic v. Moritz et al
Plaintiff: Aleksandra Milutinovic
Defendant: Christopher Moritz, City of Seattle and Eugene Schubeck
Case Number: 2:2016cv00365
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 83 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant City of Seattle's 84 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING plaintiff's 83 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment : Noting Date 1/26/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Defendants City of Seattle and Officer Schubeck's to 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment, plaintiff's claims against such defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice; the Court REMANDS the balance of this case to King County Superior Court, effective fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(City of Seattle and Eugene Schubeck terminated.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to defendants City of Seattle's and Eugene Schubeck's Motion for Summary Judgment ; RENOTING defendants' 53 Motion for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 9/29/2017 ; striking trial date of 10/23/2017 and remaining deadlines ; striking Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Relief to Continue Noting Date, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Relief; RENOTING Defendants' 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 8/25/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Dismiss Discrimination Claims from Complaint. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER striking in part and granting in part Defendant's 41 Second Motion for Sanctions; trial date and related deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: Jury Trial is set for 10/23/2017, Discovery completed by 6/19/2017, Dispositive moti ons due by 7/20/2017, Motions in Limine due by 9/21/2017, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2017 at 01:30 PM. Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/6/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendants' 41 Second MOTION for Sanctions Requesting Dismissal Under Rule 37(b)(2); Noting Date 4/14/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part dfts City of Seattle's and Officer Eugene Schubeck's 33 Motion for discovery sanctions; denying in part and striking in part plaintiff's 35 Motion to strike or renote; Five Day Ju ry Trial is set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Discovery completed by 4/21/2017, Dispositive motions due by 5/25/2017, Motions in Limine due by 7/20/2017, Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/31/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/31/2017, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milutinovic v. Moritz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksandra Milutinovic
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moritz
Represented By: Paul Jay Walchenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Amanda Hsiao-Ying Brings
Represented By: Scott P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Schubeck
Represented By: Amanda Hsiao-Ying Brings
Represented By: Scott P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?