Baker v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard J Baker
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. and Majesco Entertainment
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation, Electronic Arts Inc and Nintendo of America, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Richard J Baker
Case Number: 2:2016cv00396
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Defendants. This judgment disposes of all claims and counterclaims before the Court. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying plaintiff's 150 Motion for an indicative ruling on his untimely motion for reconsideration by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 136 Motion for Leave to File outside of 14 days Motion for Reconsideration; terminating Plaintiff's 142 Second Motion for Reconsideration; terminating Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Regards to Audio-Visual Transceivers. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (swt)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Sonal N Mehta(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A Buresh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Mark Christopher Lang(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michelle Lyons Marriott(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L McFarland
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Sonal N Mehta(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J Coyne(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Linda Jean Thayer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majesco Entertainment
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Zachary David Silbersher(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Sonal N Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Electronic Arts Inc
Represented By: Sonal N Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Richard J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?