Wright et al v. Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry D. Wright and Deborah A. Wright
Defendant: Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00417
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order re: 71 Stipulated Motion. Plaintiff's claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety without an award of fees or costs to either party. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE-NOTING defendant United States of America's 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 8/4/2017 ; The United States may file its supplemental reply on or before that date, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Defendant Valor Healthcare, Inc.'s 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; Plaintiff's claims against Valor Healthcare, Inc. for healthcare provided after May 31, 2015, are hereby DISMISSED, signed signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 49 Stipulated Motion; Discovery deadline extended to 7/28/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; Discovery ddl extended to 7/3/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) extended to 6/3/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting plaintiff's 33 Motion to Substitute Identity of Plaintiff by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Edward James Hynes
Represented By: Rebecca S Ringer
Represented By: Philip J. Vanderhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Wright
Represented By: Vernon W. Harkins
Represented By: John R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Wright
Represented By: Vernon W. Harkins
Represented By: John R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?