Tolentino v. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Francis Tolentino
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Robert M. Cowan and Jeh Charles Johnson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00451
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting plaintiff's 43 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Cross-Motion and Opposition due 10/23/2017, and shall be noted for 12/1/2017. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's optional Reply due 11/6/2017. Defendants' optional Reply due 11/20/2017. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Plaintiff's third 36 Motion for Extension of Time to submit motion for summary judgment; motion for summary judgment due 8/28/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Plaintiff's second 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due 8/14/2017; Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition due 9/25/2017; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and optional Reply due 10/9/2017; Defendants' optional Reply due 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due 7/31/2017; Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response due 9/11/2017; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and optional Reply due 9/25/2017; Defendants' optional Reply due 10/9/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 6/12/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report within 10 days of this order, by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion to amend his complaint; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 18 Motion to reactivate this case and to dismiss Mr. Tolentino's complaint; denying as moot Plaintiff's 19 Motion for an extension to time. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolentino v. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Tolentino
Represented By: William Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?