Jama et al v. Golden Gate America LLC
Plaintiff: Abdikhadar Jama, Jees Jees and Mohamed Mohamed
Defendant: Golden Gate America LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00611
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 85 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Class Representatives' Incentive Awards signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting parties' 81 Stipulated Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Settlement Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 10:30 AM, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 77 Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule ; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 9/6/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 57 Motion to Certify Class, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 57 Motion to Certify Class; the motion is renoted for 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Defendant EAN Holdings LLC's 49 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Defendant Golden Gate America LLC's 45 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Any and all claims against that Golden Gate are again DISMISSED. Plaintiffs' attorneys are hereby ORDERED to pay Golden Gate reasonable fees of $1,000 within fourteen days of the date of this order. (SWT)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 29 Golden Gate's motion for summary judgment. All claims against Golden Gate are hereby DISMISSED. Plaintiff has fourteen days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jama et al v. Golden Gate America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdikhadar Jama
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jees Jees
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mohamed
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate America LLC
Represented By: Taylor S Ball
Represented By: Harry James Franklyn Korrell, III
Represented By: Laura Turczanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?