Centuori v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Centuori
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv00654
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The court having been notified of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and w ithout costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. At trial, Mr. Centuori may pursue his negligence claim based on UPS's rerouting the packages and the placement of the packages at Mr. Centuori's home. The court also grants UPS leave to file a Daubert motion pertaining to Mr. Wade in the manner described in this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting 15 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2017, Discovery Motions due by 3/21/2017, Motions in Limine due by 5/8/2017, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2017, Deposition Designations due 5/31/2017; Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/20/2017, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 6/12/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2017 before Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centuori v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Centuori
Represented By: Matthew N Menzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?