Bailey v. Alpha Technologies Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Yvette Bailey
Defendant: Alpha Technologies Incorporated, Altair Advanced Industries Inc, ABC, Inc. 1-10, Frederick Kaiser, Jane Doe Kaiser, Grace Borsari and John Doe Borsari
Case Number: 2:2016cv00727
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting parties' 135 Stipulated Motion for Disbursement of Funds signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Finance)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 129 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment. Execution of the judgment against Plaintiff (Dkt. No. 116 ) is STAYED pending Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 123 Motion and Order for Approval of Supersedeas Bond. Within seven (7) days of this order, Plaintiff shall deposit $10,000 in the Court registry in order to secure and post a supersedeas bond in this matter. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Finance)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting Defendant/Counter-Claimant Defendant Grace Borsari's 106 Motion for Entry of Judgment. The Court ORDERS and ADJUDGES that Plaintiff Yvette Bailey, as a result of her breach of three promissory notes, is liable to Defendant Grace Borsari for the following amounts: 1. $6,400 in unpaid principle; 2. $720 in prejudgment interest; 3. $5000 in attorney fees.Bailey's total liability is $12,120. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting Defendant's 97 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Plaintiff's claim for wrongful termination in violation of public policy is DISMISSED with prejudice against all Defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER allowing litigants bring food and drink into the Courthouse during trial commencing on 11/6/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: CSOs
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 62 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Filing Deadline for Motions in Limine. Motions in limine are due by October 12, 2017. Responses to motions in limine are due by October 23, 2017. In accordance with the Local Civil Rules, reply briefs are not authorized. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is DENIED as to Plaintiff's wrongful termination claim and Defendants' motion to strike evidence. It is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's FLSA and MWA claims, willful withholding of wages claim, defamation claim and as to Defendant Borsari's breach of contract counterclaim. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER extending discovery cutoff date; The deposition of Mr. Turnquest must be conducted no later than October 6, 2017. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in order to conduct the deposition of Mr. Turnquest by this deadline. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 35 Motion to Compel by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 32 Stipulated Motion to continue trial and trial dates as follows: 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/28/2017, Discovery completed by 7/7/2017, Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2017, Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2017, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 10/30/2017, Jury Trial is continued to 11/6/2017 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; plaintiff may amend her complaint within 30 days. The Court's dismissal of those claims will take effect only of plaintiff does not amend them within 30 days by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Alpha Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Bailey
Represented By: Jie Woo Kim
Represented By: Patrick Leo McGuigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Tobias Piering
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altair Advanced Industries Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Tobias Piering
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, Inc. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Kaiser
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Tobias Piering
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Borsari
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Tobias Piering
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Borsari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?