McBride v. VF Outdoor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael McBride
Defendant: VF Outdoor, LLC, John Doe and John Doe Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00754
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice re parties' 75 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REVISED ORDER for Disbursement of Minor Settlement; re Plaintiff's 70 Petition, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re Plaintiff Michael McBride's 62 Petition for Approval of Minor Settlement and for Disbursal of Settlement Proceeds, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 59 Petition for appointment of attorney Patrick Trudell as settlement guardian ad litem filed by Michael McBride by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 42 motions in limine by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER NARROWING THE SCOPE OF CONTESTED ISSUES FOR TRIAL by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 31 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride v. VF Outdoor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McBride
Represented By: Scott Allen McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Outdoor, LLC
Represented By: Farron Danelle Curry
Represented By: Ryan W Dumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?