Somerlott v. McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Somerlott
Defendant: McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv00789
Filed: May 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE re: 105 107 signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. See order for details. (PM)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 102 Motion to Strike the Errata Sheet for the Deposition of Steven Tipton. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying Defendant's 78 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert John R. Cary. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 40 -1 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Defendant's 60 Motion to exclude Plaintiff's economic expert Neil Bennett as untimely disclosed; denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion for leave to designate Neil Bennet as his economic expert; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 72 surreply/motion to strike portions of Defendant's reply; denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Exclude William Skilling. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Compel Advanced Medical Group. Plaintiff shall pay to Advance Medical Group its reasonable attorney's fees incurred in responding to this motion in the amount of $1,344.00. Fees due within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Defendant's 36 Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying plaintiff's 22 Motion for Discovery signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somerlott v. McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Somerlott
Represented By: Edward H. Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Diane Ellwein Baker
Represented By: Jordann Hallstrom
Represented By: Elizabeth V. McNulty(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?