United States of America v. McHenry et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Blair Allen McHenry, Barbara McLeod and Susan Kane-Ronning
Case Number: 2:2016cv00798
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Government's 29 Unopposed Motion for Deficiency Judgment; directing Clerk of Court to enter a deficiency judgment in favor of the United States of America and against Blair Allen McHenry. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Confirmation of Foreclosure Sale re 25 Order on Motion for Order for Foreclosure Sale. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting the Government's unopposed 24 Motion for an order of foreclosure sale. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: certified copies to USMO, finance
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Government's 18 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Blair Allen McHenry, Barbara McLeod, and Susan Kane-Ronning. The Court AWARDS the following relief to the Government: the United States has and recovers judgment in its favor against Defendant Blair Allen McHenry, in the sum of $387,998.94, ($371,734.51 principal, $16,264.43 interest accrued through January 27, 2017), plus interest accrued in the amount of $26.81 daily from January 27, 2017 to the date of judgment; plus interest from the date of judgment at the rate set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961, and filing fees allowed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(a)(2). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(see order for more details) (PM) cc: Financial Deputy, USMO
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McHenry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aditi Paranjpye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Allen McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kane-Ronning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?