Citizens for Clean Air et al v. McCarthy et al
Plaintiff: Citizens for Clean Air and Sierra Club
Defendant: Gina McCarthy and Dennis McLerran
Case Number: 2:2016cv00857
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed 41 Motion to terminate the consent decree and dismiss the case. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' stipulated motion 38 to extend the deadline for the motion for costs of litigation to 12/5/17 by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 36 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Motion for Costs of Litigation. The deadline for the motion for costs of litigation is now June 5, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for Clean Air et al v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for Clean Air
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Erik Grafe(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kenta Tsuda(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Erik Grafe(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kenta Tsuda(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McLerran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?