Fair Housing Center of Washington v. Breier-Scheetz Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Washington
Defendant: Breier-Scheetz Properties, LLC and Frederick Breier-Scheetz
Case Number: 2:2016cv00922
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 115 Third MOTION for Order to Show Cause: The defendants have substantially complied with the Court's order regarding training. See Von Doemming Decl., docket no. 124 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re Parties' 117 Stipulation: Plaintiff's 115 Third MOTION for Order to Show Cause is re-noted for 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; re plaintiff's 76 , 93 Petitions for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER setting hearing on Plaintiff's 93 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause; RENOTING Plaintiff's 93 Petition: Noting Date 2/14/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 at 10:30 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER lifting stay previously imposed on Plaintiff's Petition for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Civil Contempt (Dkt. 91 ); RENOTING plaintiff's 93 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Civil Contempt and for Actual and Punitive Damages : Noting Date 1/4/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 76 Petition for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt ; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 84 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. The Court STAYS (1) enforcement of the Judgment as to actual and punitive damages, conditioned upon Defendants posting a supersedeas bond in the amount of $130,762.36 no later than 9/7/2018, and (2) enforcement of the Supplemental Judgment in a Civil Case (Dkt. 74 ), conditioned upon Defendants posting a supersedeas bond in the amount of $189,762.69 no later than9/7/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER lifting the stay on Plaintiff's 76 Petition for Order to Show Cause, and RENOTING the Motion to 7/27/2018; striking as moot Plaintiff's 80 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Staying Petition for Order to Show Cause. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER staying Plaintiff's 76 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, and striking the noting date pending further Court Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT BY THE COURT: Plaintiff Fair Housing Center of Washington's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs, docket no. 62 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Supplemental judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $184,741.01 in attorney's fees and costs. (SWT)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER amending schedule as follows: Bench Trial is set for 9/18/2017 at 09:00 AM ; Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/1/2017, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 9/1/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2017 at 01:30 PM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 17 Response/Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 6/2/2017; Defendants' Response, if any, due by 6/16/2017; Plaintiff's Reply, if any, due by 6/23/2017.(SWT)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Housing Center of Washington v. Breier-Scheetz Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Washington
Represented By: Angela C Galloway
Represented By: Jesse Andrew Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breier-Scheetz Properties, LLC
Represented By: George Theodore Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Breier-Scheetz
Represented By: George Theodore Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?