Hanson v. Snohomish County et al
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Hanson
Defendant: Snohomish County, Ty Trenary, Kaitlin Geary, Jeffrey Langsam and Julie Rountree
Case Number: 2:2016cv00930
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 84 Stipulation; this action is dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney's fees to any party, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties should be prepared to discuss the possibility of resolving the case by mediation at the Status Conference set for Thursday, October 12, 2017, at 9:00 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 62 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's wrongful death and special survival claims; striking as moot Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and striking as moot in part Defendants' 45 Motion to Dismiss Individual Fourteenth Amendment Claims. The claims of plaintiff Julie Ann Hanson in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Marilyn Mowan, including the Estate of Marilyn Mowan's Fourteenth Amendment claim, remain. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff Julie Ann Hanson's 42 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall e-file the Amended Complaint, Dkt. 42-1, within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Any answer is due within fourteen (14) days after the Amended Complaint is filed. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY; Expert Witness deadline extended to 5/24/2017, Rebuttal Expert Testimony extended to 6/23/2017, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE PROTECTIVE ORDER granting in part Defendant Snohomish County's 22 MOTION for Protective Order. Snohomish County shall only be required to provide a 30(b)(6) designee to testify as to topics 8, 9 and 10 for the four (4) deaths of a similar kind (suicide) for the period November 2013 to the present. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for leave to amend. First Amended Complaint due within 7 days of this Minute Order. Answer due within 14 days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Snohomish County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Hanson
Represented By: Cheryl L Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin Geary
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Langsam
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Rountree
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Michael C Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?