Kimani v. Bethesda Lutheran Communities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grace Kimani
Defendant: Bethesda Lutheran Communities, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00992
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Van Siclen, Stocks & Firkins' 42 Motion for Leave to Withdraw, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (Attorney Stephanie Messplay and Robert C Van Siclen terminated)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re parties' 39 Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Pretrial Deadlines : Dispositive motions due by 10/13/2017, Motions in Limine due by 12/15/2017, Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/5/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/5/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying defendant's 31 Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & RELATED DATES re parties' 23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: Length of trial: 5 days, Jury Trial is set for 2/5/2018, Discovery completed by 7/14/2017, Settlement conference to be held by 7/28/2017, D ispositive motions due by 8/14/2017, Motions in Limine due by 10/16/2017, Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/6/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/6/2017, Pretrial conference to be scheduled by the Court, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimani v. Bethesda Lutheran Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Kimani
Represented By: Stephanie Beach
Represented By: Robert C Van Siclen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Lutheran Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Leah C Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?