Westridge Townhomes Owners Association v. Great American Assurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Westridge Townhomes Owners Association
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company and Greenwich Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01011
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Compel; denying Defendant Greenwhich Insurance Company's 69 Cross Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Stipulated Motion extending until 12/22/2017 the deadline to complete discovery for the purpose of deposing Defendants' experts, Jim Perrault and Dennis Smith. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying Defendants' 65 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying Defendants' 53 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting plaintiff's 38 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint within 14 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westridge Townhomes Owners Association v. Great American Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westridge Townhomes Owners Association
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Todd Christopher Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Douglas G Houser(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Kevin F. Buckley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Douglas G Houser(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?