Sunwood Condominium Association v. Aetna Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Sunwood Condominium Association
Defendant: Aetna Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois, American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Arrowood Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of Connecticut and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01012
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 139 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER re: parties' 137 Notice of Settlement. The trial date is vacated and parties are directed to file a stipulated dismissal or joint status report no later than 60 days from this order. Plaintiff's pending 133 motions in limine are terminated. Clerk is directed to statistically close case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 128 Motion to Dismiss Defendant St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Defendant St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company is DISMISSED with prejudice and without fees or costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER re the proposed jury instructions due 10/19/2018. The parties shall submit a joint set of instructions, including a proposed verdict form. Furthermore, the Court ORDERS that motions in limine, if any, should be filed no later than Friday, October 19, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER directing counsel to meet and confer regarding a new trial date and to propose a new date to the Court within 14 days of the issuance of this order. The Court has trial dates available between October 22, 2018 and December 17, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying Defendant National Surety Corporation's 118 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER. The jury trial in this matter has been continued from December 5, 2017 to April 2, 2018. (Dkt. No. 120 .) Case management dates are re-set as follows: proposed pretrial order is due by March 22, 2018; trial briefs, proposed voir dire, and jury instructions are due by March 26, 2018. All other pretrial dates remain unchanged. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant National Surety Corporation's 118 MOTION for Reconsideration re 116 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court hereby calls for a response to NSC's motion for reconsideration from Plaintiff. Plainti ff shall file a response brief of six (6) pages or less no later than Monday, December 11, 2017. Defendant's reply brief shall be four (4) pages or less and is due by Friday, December 15, 2017. Neither party is required to include a factual background in its briefing. The motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 118 ) is RENOTED to December 15, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby VACATES this case's current trial date of December 4, 2017. Counsel is DIRECTED to appear at a status conference on Tuesday, December 5, 2017 at 9:00 am to discuss a new trial date. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment against Defendants National Surety Corporation (Dkt. No. 79 ) and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Dkt. No. 82 ) are renoted for the date of 9/29/2017. Notwithstanding t he change in noting date, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file any reply to Defendant National Surety Corporation's response to its motion for partial summary judgment by the original noting date of 9/15/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Stipulated Motion to dismiss defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying Defendant St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company's 48 Motion to Compel; granting Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's 53 Motion for Joinder; granting Sunwood Condominium Association's 54 Motion for Protective Order; granting Plaintiff Sunwood Condominium Association's 55 Motion for Protective Order; granting Defendants General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's 65 Motion for Joinder, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(SWT)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Stipulated Motion dismissing defendant The Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of Connecticut by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunwood Condominium Association v. Aetna Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunwood Condominium Association
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael K McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Surety Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?