United States of America v. Gould et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: David A Gould, Jane C Polinder, Brookline Properties, Inc, Whatcom County Treasurer, Tario and Associates, PS, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services, Financial Concepts, Ltd and Goldstar Enterprises, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01041
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER re: Government's unopposed 120 Motion to extend deadlines. The deadline for deposing defendant David A. Gould by videoconference or similar method is EXTENDED to September 30, 2019; The Government's motion for sanctions, docket no. 101 , is RENOTED to Friday, October 11, 2019, and the Government's supplemental reply is due on the new noting date; Dispositive motions due by 10/28/2019; deadline for filing all motions related to expert witnesses is extended to 11/4/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER directing the Government to make arrangements to depose defendant David Gould by videoconference or similar method; deferring and RENOTING to 8/23/2019 Government's 101 Second MOTION for Sanctions; extending deadline for filing dispositive motions to 9/12/2019; extending deadline for filing all motions related to expert witnesses to 9/19/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER renoting Government's 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions to 6/21/2019; Response to the 15 motion due 6/19/2019; Dispositive motions deadline is extended from 6/17/2019 to 6/20/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER granting Government's 109 Motion for Entry of Default, entering default against defendants Brookline Properties, Financial Concepts, Ltd., and Goldstar Enterprises, Inc. ; granting Government's 111 Unopposed Motion for Ex tension of Time: deadline for filing of dispositive motions is extended to 6/17/2019, deadline for filing all motions related to expert witnesses is extended to 6/24/2019; RENOTING Government's 101 Second MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant David Gould : Noting Date 6/14/2019; directing defendant David Gould to provide a valid residential address in Taiwan. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER SETTING this matter for a Jury Trial ; granting in part and denying in part defendant David Gould's 97 , 99 Motion for Protective Order and Extension of the Deadline for Completing Discovery: The deadline for Gould to appear for a deposition is EXTENDED to 5/6/2019 ; granting in part and denying in part Government's 103 Motion to Vacate Trial Date and Related Deadlines: Dispositive motions deadline is EXTENDED to 5/23/2019, Motions related to expert witnesses deadl ine is EXTENDED to 5/30/2019; trial date, the pretrial conference, and the deadlines for filing motions in limine, trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions, proposed jury instructions, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and an agre ed pretrial order are STRICKEN and will be reset, if appropriate, after the Court rules on any dispositive motions ; DEFERRING and RENOING Government's 101 Second MOTION for Sanctions : Noting Date 6/14/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, plaintiff shall file a reply to defendant David A. Gould's 90 Response to the Minute Order entered December 17, 2018, (Dkt. 88 ). Defendants Jane C. Polinder and Washington State Department of Social and Health Services shall file briefs within seven (7) days after the Government files its reply. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Government's 83 Motion for Order to Appear or Plead by a Date Certain. The deadline for defendants Brookline Properties, Financial Concepts, Ltd., and Goldstar Enterprises, Inc. to file a responsive pleading or motion or otherwise appear in this action is 1/31/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER denying defendant David Gould's 67 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 74 Motion for Sanctions ; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 75 Motion for Leave to Serve by Publication for Extension of Time to Serve ; denying defendant David Gould's 77 Motion to Dismiss; Joint Status Report due within fourteen days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER striking defendant Jane C Polinder's 57 Motion to Compel; denying defendant David Gould's 55 Motion for Protective Order, Gould shall provide to counsel for the government, within fourteen days of the date of this Minute Order, copies of all his passports; granting parties' 58 Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines as follows: Defendant Gould's deposition shall be conducted on or before 8/3/2018, Discovery completed by 8/31/2018, Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 60 Stipulated Motion to Expedite Motion for Protective Order ; RENOTING Defendant Gould's 55 MOTION for Protective Order : Noting Date 3/23/2018; RENOTING parties' 58 Agreed MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines : Noting Date 3/23/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES: Bench Trial is set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions due by 3/7/2018, Discovery completed by 4/15/2018, Dispositive motions due by 5/15/2018, Motions in Limine due by 8/2/2018, Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/17/2017, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/17/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting Government's 51 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery treated as requesting a continuance of trial date and remaining deadlines; Jury Trial date is CONTINUED to 9/4/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Defendant David A. Gould's 49 Motion to Dismiss is treated as a motion for reconsideration and is DENIED. (PM)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES: Bench Trial set for 5/7/2018; Discovery motions due by 12/7/2017, Discovery completed by 1/15/2018, Dispositive motions due by 2/15/2018, Motions in Limine due by 4/5/2018, P retrial Order due by 4/20/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/20/2018, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 4/20/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; plaintiff shall electronically file its amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant David A. Gould's 28 Motion to Dismiss. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Defendant Gould via first-class international airmail and e-mail) (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gould et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles J Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane C Polinder
Represented By: John Mark Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookline Properties, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whatcom County Treasurer
Represented By: Royce Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tario and Associates, PS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Social and Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Concepts, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldstar Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?