January 31, 2019 |
Filing
118
ORDER ADOPTING 113 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 103 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's third amended complaint (Dkt. 82 ), and this action, are DISMISSED with prejudice as to defendants Lance Rogers and Steve Ewing. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (TH)
|
October 26, 2018 |
Filing
112
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS denying Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying Defendants' 96 Motion for Protective Order; denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Reconsideration; gra nting Plaintiff's 109 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' pending summary judgment motion; denying Plaintiff's 111 Motion for extension of discovery deadline; RE-NOTING Defendants' 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment for 11/2/2018. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(PM)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
108
ORDER adopting the 98 Report and Recommendation and granting Defendants' 84 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's third amended complaint (Dkt. 82 ), and this action, are DISMISSED with prejudice as to defendants Brittany West, Mark Jones, and Sheryl Albert for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(PM)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
99
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (TH)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
88
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. Discovery completed by 8/17/2018, Dispositive motions due by 9/17/2018. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(PM)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting plaintiff's 79 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File More Definite Statement. The Clerk is directed to file plaintiff's more definite statement which was received by the Court on April 1, 2018. Defendants shall file an answer, or other responsive pleading, to plaintiff's second amended complaint not later than May 4, 2018. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(PM)
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
78
ORDER granting plaintiff's 76 Second Motion for Extension of Time a more Definite Statement ; Plaintiff shall file his more definite statement not later than 3/28/2018 ; directing Clerk to send copies of dkts. 39 , 44 , 59 and 62 togeth er with this Order, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (Attachments: # 1 Dkt. 39 Main Document, # 2 Dkt. 39-1, # 3 Dkt. 39-2, # 4 Dkt. 39-3, # 5 Dkt. 39-4, # 6 Dkt. 39-5, # 7 Dkt. 39-6, # 8 Dkt. 39-7, # 9 Dkt. 39-8, # 10 Dkt. 39-9, # 11 Dkt. 39-10, # 12 Dkt.39-11, # 13 Dkt. 39-12, # 14 Dkt. 39-13, # 15 Dkt. 44, # 16 Dkt. 59, # 17 Dkt. 62)**311 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SWT)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
77
ORDER adopting the 69 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 67 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied. Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Clarification and for Extension of Time remains to be considered by the Honorable James P. Donohue, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (PM)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections. Plaintiff shall have until January 22, 2018, to file Objections. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (TH)
|
November 17, 2017 |
Filing
73
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File his More Definite Statement. Plaintiff is directed to file his more definite statement not later than January 16, 2018, and is advised that his failure to comply with this deadline may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (TH)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 65 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order; Because the deadline to file a more definite statement has passed, the Court amends the deadline to November 14, 2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SWT)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
63
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SHERYL ALLBERT by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(RS) cc S Allbert w/2nd amd complaint, order, service forms
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying plaintiff's 48 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(RS)
|
June 9, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; dismissing defendants from civil rights action; Judge Donohue shall issue a service order of plaintiff's second amended complaint on defendants Brittany West, Lance Rogers, S Ewing, PA Shirley and c/o Jones by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(RS)
|