Shokri v. Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Behrouz Shokri
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01132
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re: parties' 156 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Stay re: defendant's 147 Motion for Bill of Costs. All proceedings related to Defendant's Motion for Costs (Dkt. 147 ), including all responsive briefing and resolution of the motion, is stayed pending the issuance of a mandate pursuant to Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings regarding defendant's 147 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS re parties' 148 Stipulated Motion. All proceedings related to Defendant's Motion for Bill of Costs (Dkt. 47 ), including all responsive briefing and resolution of the motion, is stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff's anticipated appeal. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting Defendant's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Seal. Exhibits EE and FF to the Supplemental Declaration of Scott C.G. Blankenship in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkts. # 136 and # 137 ) shall be immediately UNSEALED BY THE CLERK. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Seal. Exhibits CC, EE, FF, GG, HH, NNN, and OOO (Dkts. # 111 , # 113 , # 114 , # 115 , # 116 , # 120 , and # 121 ) shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. Exhibit DD (Dkt. # 112 ) shall be immediately UNSEALED BY THE CLERK. Within 7 days, Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Exhibits II, JJ, and KK (Dkts. # 117 , # 118 , and # 119 ). Exhibits II, JJ, and KK Dkts. # 117 , # 118 , and # 119 , shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 91 Stipulated Motion to Continue Dispositive Motions and Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date. Dispositive motions due by 1/16/2018, Motions in Limine due by 3/20/2018, Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/11/2018, Jury Trial is set for 4/16/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 73 Motion to Seal ; Exhibits 4, 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Scott C.G. Blankenship in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkts. 75 , 76 and 77 ) shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL ; Defendant shall file a supplemental motion to seal Exhibit 8 ; Dkt. 78 shall remain under seal until the Court considers the supplemental motion, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS granting in part and denying in part as moot Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Additional Depositions; granting Defendant's 45 Motion for Extension of Rebuttal Expert Reports and for Expert Discovery; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/29/2017, deadline to complete expert discovery extended to November 28, 2017; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 49 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIONTO HOLD DEPOSITIONS AFTER THECLOSE OF DISCOVERY by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Discovery Motion; deadline extended to 9/22/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 34 Motion to File Under Seal signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting plaintiff's 19 Motion to Seal signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shokri v. Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behrouz Shokri
Represented By: Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship
Represented By: Jordan A Taren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?