A.M. v. Valve Corporation
Plaintiff: A. M.
Defendant: Valve Corporation and Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv01166
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 147 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 151 Motion for Attorney Fees; The Court awards a total of $133,882.75 in attorney's fees to Defendant against Plaintiff, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant Valve Corporation to provide the Court with complete copies of (1) Plaintiff's original discovery responses from January 2017, and (2) Plaintiff's supplemental discovery responses disclosed after the disp ositive motion deadline, no later than Thursday, October 12, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. ; The parties should be prepared to discuss the following issues at the Pretrial Conference this Friday, October 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m (see Order for details). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part Plaintiff's 92 Motion in Limine ; granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part Defendant's 91 Motion in Limine. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff A.M. to provide the Court with a complete hard copy of the transcript of the Deposition of Ivan Greenspan taken on June 9, 2017, and the initial expert report prepared by Dr. Greenspan in this matter, no later than Friday, October 6, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. Any trial brief filed by either party shall not exceed twenty-four (24) pages in length. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff A.M. is DIRECTED to provide the Court with the complaint filed with the State of California, Department of Fair Employment and Housing, referenced in paragraph 16 of plaintiff's complaint, no later than Monday, September 18, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER setting Oral Argument on Defendant's 63 , 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Wednesday, September 20, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. ; extending Motions in Limine deadline to 9/28/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 69 Second Motion to Seal. The unredacted versions of plaintiff's response to defendant's partial motion for summary judgment, docket no. 76 , and the Declaration of Plaintiff A.M., docket no. 77 , shall remain under seal. The Clerk is directed to unseal Exhibits 1, 3-7, and 9-11 to the Declaration of Barbara Rhoads-Weaver, docket no. 78 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 58 Motion to Seal. The unredacted versions of defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, docket no. 63 , and Exhibits 1 and 3 to the Declaration of Laurence A. Shapero, docket nos. 64 , 65 , shall remain under seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 46 Motion to Seal ; directing the Clerk to unseal 52 Supplemental Declaration of Barbara Rhoads-Weaver and the exhibits thereto. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendant's 46 MOTION to Seal ; Noting Date 7/7/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Compel. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 36 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. v. Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Douglas Chadwick Biggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?