Jane Does 1-10 et al v. University of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Jane Does 1-10 and John Does 1-10
Defendant: University of Washington, David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman and Perry Tapper
Case Number: 2:2016cv01212
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney John R Nicholson. Filed by Defendant University of Washington. (Nicholson, John) Changed firm address 12/4/2018 (DS).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney David B Edwards for Counter Defendants Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Satre, Mallory)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER re: parties' #191 stipulation to stay case. The court GRANTS the stipulated motion and STAYS this matter pending the outcome of the present appeal before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Joint Status Report due within ten (10) days of the return of the Ninth Circuit's mandate or any other disposition of the appeal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION to Vacate Trial and Related Dates and Stay this Case until Conclusion of Appeal by parties re 187 Telephone Conference,,, (Breen, Peter)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Attorney Kim Christensen Clark added as counsel for John Does 1-10 per #190 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kim Christensen Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Does 1-10. (Clark, Kim)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2018 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018, (ND)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sara Ainsworth for Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Vanessa Power; Def Counsel: Daleiden: Peter Breen; UW: John Nicholson; CR: Nickie Drury; Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2018. The court hears from counsel re: the parties' letters re: discovery dispute (Dkt. # #185 , #186 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the court rules as follows: Defendant Daleiden's motion to compel additional responses to Interrogatory No. 2 and Request for Production No. 6 is denied. The court directs the parties to confer regarding staying the matter entirely, particularly depositions, until the Ninth Circuit issues a ruling in the pending appeal. Any oral depositions noted for Doe Plaintiffs shall occur by telephone to maintain Doe Plaintiffs' anonymity while the appeal of the courts preliminary injunction is pending. (AD)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 LETTER from Peter Breen re #184 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, filed by David Daleiden(an individual) (Breen, Peter)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER from Vanessa Power re #184 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, filed by Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs and Defendant David Daleiden's request for telephonic conference to resolve discovery dispute. Telephone Conference set for 8/22/2018 at 09:00 AM. The Court further orders parties to file separate letters detailing discovery dispute by no later than 8/20/2018 at 12:00 PM. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 7/10/2018 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2018, (ND)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying Defendant David Daleiden's #171 Motion strike Defendant and Crossclaim Defendant University of Washington's affirmative defenses to the crossclaim. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the protective order Doe Plaintiffs' request with respect to Mr. Daleiden's written discovery requests. (See Doe Ltr.; Daleiden Ltr. ; UW Ltr.). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Vanessa Power; Def Counsel: UW & Perry Tapper: Nancy Garland; David Daleiden: Peter Breen; CR: Nickie Drury; Telephone Conference held on 7/10/2018. The court hears from counsel re: the parties' letters re: discovery dispute (Dkts. # #177 , #178 , and #179 ). The matter is taken under submission. Written order to be issued. (AD)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 LETTER from Peter Breen re Discovery Dispute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 2, Defendant's First Requests to Produce to Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit 3, Plaintiffs' 7-2-18 Letter on Discovery Dispute)(Breen, Peter)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER from Vanessa Soriano Power re Protective Order Quashing Discovery (Power, Vanessa)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER from University of Washington re phone conference 7.10.18 (Garland, Nancy)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by John R Nicholson on behalf of Defendant University of Washington. (Nicholson, John)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order The parties have agreed to and the court has approved the use of Local Rule 7(i) telephonic hearing procedures to resolve a discovery dispute. The court orders the parties to file separate 2-page letters describing their position with respect to the discovery dispute no later than Friday, July 6, 2018. The court will hold a telephonic conference concerning the dispute on Tuesday, July 10, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The court's courtroom deputy will contact the parties with instructions for dialing into the conference. The court reserves the option of requiring the parties to fully brief the dispute if the court determines that such briefing is necessary. Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, 7/10/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY, filed by Cross Claimant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #171 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaim of UW re #163 Answer to Crossclaim (Breen, Peter)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 RESPONSE, by Cross Defendant University of Washington, to #171 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaim of UW re #163 Answer to Crossclaim . (Garland, Nancy)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3 days*. Bench Trial is set for 2/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/29/2018, Motions due by 9/28/2018, Discovery completed by 10/29/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/27/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/27/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/14/2019, Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2019, Deposition Designations due by 2/6/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/19/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 2/19/2019. (AD)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #16 Motion to Certify Class; appointing class representatives and class counsel, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaim of UW re #163 Answer to Crossclaim , filed by Cross Claimant David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/11/2018, (Breen, Peter)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #162 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Daleiden's Counterclaim ; by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Bowman, Jill)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimant David Daleiden, to #162 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Daleiden's Counterclaim. (Breen, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED ANSWER to Third #77 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant University of Washington by David Daleiden. (Breen, Peter)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sarah Pitlyk receipt no 0981-525-4705 by Cross Claimant David Daleiden, Defendant David Daleiden, Counter Claimant David Daleiden (Crittenden, William)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 SUPPLEMENT re #16 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendant David Daleiden (Breen, Peter)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DECLARATION of Sara L. Ainsworth re #164 Supplement, by Counter Defendants Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Edwards, David)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SUPPLEMENT re #160 Order, Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Counter Defendants Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Edwards, David)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ANSWER to #158 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by University of Washington.(Garland, Nancy)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Daleiden's Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff Jane Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/6/2018, (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney KC Lynne Harding for Counter Defendants Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Directing Supplemental Briefing on Class Certification Motion; RENOTING Plaintiffs' #16 MOTION to Certify Class : Noting Date 3/26/2018, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 AMENDED ORDER granting Defendant David Daleiden's #131 MOTION to clarify that the preliminary injunction does not require redaction of non-personal corporate information. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ANSWER to #77 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant University of Washington, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by David Daleiden.(Breen, Peter)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ANSWER to #77 Amended Complaint by Perry Tapper, University of Washington.(Garland, Nancy)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Edwards, David)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting Defendant David Daleiden's #131 Motion to clarify preliminary injunction #130 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (see order for details) (PM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lauren Wigginton for Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER FOLLOWING SECOND APPEAL staying its consideration of Doe Plaintiffs' #135 Motion for Summary Judgment and directing the Clerk to remove that motion from its calendar. The court DIRECTS the parties to comply with its order regarding initial disclosures and joint status report and revises the following deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/2/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/16/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 2/23/2018. The court denies as moot Defendant Daleiden's #140 Motion for Relief from Deadlines. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Seattle appeals clerk
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 DECLARATION of Jill D. Bowman filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (18-35003) as to #147 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Daleiden (CDA)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #16 MOTION to Certify Class . (Breen, Peter)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 56(d) Declaration of Peter Breen)(Breen, Peter)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (18-35003) re #88 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions, #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Defendant David Daleiden. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5146819. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Breen, Peter) Modified on 1/4/2018 to add CCA # (CDA).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE, by Defendants Perry Tapper, University of Washington, to #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction. (Garland, Nancy)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY, filed by Defendant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #140 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Peter Breen)(Breen, Peter)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Power, Vanessa)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #134 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Memorandum in support of their #16 motion for class certification. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #134 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Memorandum (Power, Vanessa)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, to #140 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. (Power, Vanessa)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/29/2017, (Breen, Peter)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPLY, filed by Defendant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #131 MOTION to Clarify that the Preliminary Injunction does not Require Redaction of Non-Personal Corporate Information re #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (Breen, Peter)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Third DECLARATION of Perry Tapper filed by Defendant University of Washington re #131 MOTION to Clarify that the Preliminary Injunction does not Require Redaction of Non-Personal Corporate Information re #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (Garland, Nancy)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #131 MOTION to Clarify that the Preliminary Injunction does not Require Redaction of Non-Personal Corporate Information re #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law . (Garland, Nancy)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, to #131 MOTION to Clarify that the Preliminary Injunction does not Require Redaction of Non-Personal Corporate Information re #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law . (Edwards, David)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Noting Date Reset re Plaintiffs' #16 MOTION to Certify Class: Noting Date 1/5/2018, per #133 Notice of Re-Noting Motion. (PM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/5/2018, (Power, Vanessa)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Memorandum, re: #16 Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Reply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/29/2017, (Power, Vanessa) Modified on 12/15/2017 to add link to motion(PM).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Re-Noting of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re #16 MOTION to Certify Class ; filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/29/2017 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2018, (AR)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Clarify that the Preliminary Injunction does not Require Redaction of Non-Personal Corporate Information re #130 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law , filed by Defendant David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/22/2017, (Breen, Peter)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER REISSUING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Vanessa Power, David Edwards, Mallory Satre; Def Counsel: Nancy Garland for University of Washington; Peter Breen and William Crittenden for David Daleiden; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/29/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #2 ). The court takes the matter under submission. Written order to follow. (AD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of William Crittenden)(Breen, Peter)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM re #125 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Plaintiffs' Additional Memorandum on Supplemental Authority and Right to Privacy by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Edwards, David)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Perry Tapper, University of Washington re #120 Response to Motion and re #125 Order for Additional Memoranda (Garland, Nancy)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER directing parties to file supplemental briefing no later than 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 11/28/2017 re: right to privacy. In-court Hearing set for 11/29/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #123 Brief - Reply by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY BRIEF re Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction #2 re #114 Order,, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa) Modified on 11/1/2017 to add link to Preliminary Injunction Motion #2 (PM).
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant David Daleiden re #120 Response to Motion & Order of Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Decl of Legarreta, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, Decl of Breen)(Breen, Peter)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Supplemental DECLARATION of Perry Tapper filed by Defendants Perry Tapper, University of Washington re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Garland, Nancy)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE, by Defendants Perry Tapper, University of Washington, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Garland, Nancy)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPENING BRIEF in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #114 Order,, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KC Lynne Harding on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Harding, KC)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Janet S Chung for Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Chung, Janet)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sara Ainsworth on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Ainsworth, Sara)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MANDATE of USCA (16-36038) as to #98 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Daleiden. The judgment of this Court, entered August 14, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. REVERSED and REMANDED (CDA)cc Case Administrator
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER. The Court orders Doe Plaintiffs and Defendants University of Washington ("UW") and Perry Tapper to submit their respective opening memoranda and supplemental evidentiary materials (if any) no later than September 19, 2017. Defendant David Daleiden shall file his memoranda and supplemental evidentiary materials (if any) in response to Doe Plaintiffs' and UW and Mr. Tapper's memoranda no later than October 17, 2017. Doe Plaintiffs and UW and Mr. Tapper may file their reply memoranda no later than October 31, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 16-36038) as to #98 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Daleiden. REVERSED and REMANDED The preliminary injunction shall remain in place for a reasonable time not to exceed 120 days to allow the district court to enter the necessary findings of fact and conclusions of law supporting injunctive relief, consistent with this disposition. (CDA)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER of USCA (16-36038) as to #98 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Daleiden (CDA)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William John Crittenden for David Daleiden added; Attorney Theresa Ann Schrempp terminated per #110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney.(SSM)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATED MOTION for withdrawal and substitution of local counsel , filed by Defendant David Daleiden. Noting Date 1/30/2017, (Schrempp, Theresa) Modified text on 1/31/2017 (RS).
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Jill Bowman, Janet Chung; Def Counsel: Nancy Garland, Peter Breen; CR: Nancy Bauer; Telephone Conference held on 1/4/2017. The court conducted a telephone conference and heard from counsel concerning its order to show cause (Dkt. #99 ) and the parties' dispute concerning a protocol for the redaction and production of documents subject to the preliminary injunction (see Dkt. # 106-08). The court made the following rulings: (1) Except for the court's administration and enforcement of the preliminary injunction (Dkt. #88 ), this matter is stayed pending resolution of Mr. Daleiden's appeal (Dkt. #98 ). The parties are directed to inform the court if there are any changes in circumstances that warrant a lifting of the stay prior to the Ninth Circuit's disposition of Mr. Daleiden's appeal. (2) The court approves the University of Washington's protocol for the redaction and production of documents covered by the preliminary injunction. The court orders the first stage of production to occur by January 20, 2017. The court further orders the parties to work together cooperatively to set reasonable deadlines for any additional productions. (AD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 LETTER from Defendant Daleiden re Issues for Telephonic Conference (Breen, Peter)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 LETTER from Plaintiffs re Issues for Telephone Conference (Bowman, Jill)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 LETTER from UW, Tapper re Issue for Telephone Conference (Garland, Nancy)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #102 Stipulated Motion to dismiss defendant Zachary Freeman by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant David Daleiden (Breen, Peter)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Washington (Garland, Nancy)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Freeman by Defendant Zachary Freeman. Noting Date 12/23/2016, (Crittenden, William)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for Wednesday, January 4, 2017 at 2:45 p.m. before Judge James L. Robart. Parties are directed to submit simultaneous letters of no more than two (2) pages stating what issues are to be addressed at the conference and each party's position on those issues. Letters due by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, December 28, 2016. (AD)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge James L. Robart as to (1) why Mr. Daleiden's motion to dismiss should not be taken off the court's calendar without prejudice to renoting the motion after the Ninth Circuit enters a ruling or otherwise disposes of Mr. Daleiden's appeal, and (2) why this matter should not be stayed pending the disposition of Mr. Daleiden's appeal. Show Cause Response due by 12/23/2016. (PM)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 USCA Case Number 16-36038 for #98 Notice of Appeal filed by David Daleiden. (CDA)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (16-36038) re #88 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions by Defendant David Daleiden. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4705673. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Schrempp, Theresa) Modified on 12/16/2016 - CCA number added (CDA).
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 LETTER from Jan Schakowsky, Ranking Member Select Investigative Panel (RS)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY, filed by Defendant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Breen, Peter)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 Stipulated Motion for further extension of initial scheduling dates and renoting of pending motion to dismiss; renoting David Daleiden's #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to 12/9/16; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/6/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/20/2017, Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2017, by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Stipulated MOTION Stipulated Motion for Further Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates and Renoting of Pending Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. Noting Date 12/2/2016, (Bowman, Jill)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Garland, Nancy)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, to #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Power, Vanessa)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re #90 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lauren Wigginton for Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lauren Wiggington FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 Receipt No. 0981-4677912 (Power, Vanessa)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lauren Wigginton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4677912 (Power, Vanessa)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and denying Defendant's #58 Motion to File a Supplemental Pleading. (AD)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 LETTER from Marsha Blackburn, Chair, Select Investigative Panel requesting clarification re the Temporary Restraining Order. (AD)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting #84 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. (AD)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting #80 Stipulated Motion for Further 30-Day Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates. (AD)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #77 Amended Complaint by Defendant David Daleiden. Noting Date 11/3/2016, (Breen, Peter)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Mallory L. Bouchee. Filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Bouchee, Mallory)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 EXHIBIT Declaration of Peter Breen re #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant David Daleiden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh E)(Breen, Peter)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant David Daleiden. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/2/2016, (Breen, Peter)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Stipulated MOTION for Further 30-day Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates With Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. Noting Date 10/31/2016, (Bowman, Jill)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Nancy Garland, on behalf of Defendant Perry Tapper, on 10/20/2016. (Edwards, David)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Summons Issued as to defendant Perry Tapper. (PM)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman, University of Washington, Perry Tapper, filed by John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Summons Perry Tapper)(Edwards, David)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting in part and denying in part Defendant Daleiden's #55 Motion to hold Plaintiffs' motion for class certification in abeyance; granting Defendant Daleiden's #49 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' second amended complaint without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiffs to file a third amended complaint within 14 days of this order. Clerk is directed to renote Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #16 Motion for class certification, and UW's #58 Motion for leave to file a supplemental response to Plaintiffs' Motion for preliminary injunction for 14 days from the date on which this order is filed: 10/18/2016. (PM)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. Noting Date 9/29/2016, (Bowman, Jill)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY, filed by Defendant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION (Breen, Peter)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, to #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. (Fogg, Steven)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. (Garland, Nancy)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting #69 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates. (AD)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re Initial Scheduling Dates by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. Noting Date 8/30/2016, (Power, Vanessa)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting Plaintiffs' #15 Motion to Proceed in Pseudonym. The court will revisit the issue if Doe Plaintiffs do not ultimately prevail on their underlying claims. (AD)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY, filed by Defendant David Daleiden, TO RESPONSE to #55 Emergency MOTION HOLD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IN ABEYANCE OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Breen, Peter)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Power, Vanessa)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, to #55 Emergency MOTION HOLD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IN ABEYANCE OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #16 MOTION to Certify Class . (Power, Vanessa)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zachary Freeman (Crittenden, William)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #16 MOTION to Certify Class . Oral Argument Requested. (Breen, Peter)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #58 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BRIEF OF WA ATTY GENL IN NORTH QUINAULT PROPERTIES, #2 Exhibit ORDER OF COURT GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS DISMISSAL PER ELEVENTH AMENDMENT IN NORTH QUINAULT PROPERTIES)(Breen, Peter)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RENOTING MOTION PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S LOCAL RULES by Judge James L. Robart. Defendant David Daleiden's #55 Emergency Motion to Hold Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification in Abeyance or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time to Respond is renoted for Friday, 8/26/2016. (AD)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Garland, Nancy)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant University of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Garland, Nancy)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/1/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/15/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Defendant David Daleiden. (Breen, Peter)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Emergency MOTION HOLD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IN ABEYANCE OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #16 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendant David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Breen, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2016, (Breen, Peter)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting Plaintiffs' #35 Motion for an Extension of the TRO. The TRO will remain in effect until such time as the court resolves Plaintiffs' pending motion for a preliminary injunction or until further order from this court. (AD)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE by Defendant David Daleiden re #52 Reply to Response to Motion (Breen, Peter)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, TO RESPONSE to #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) (Edwards, David)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mallory L. Bouchee on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Bouchee, Mallory)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schrempp, Theresa)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/9/2016, (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Zachary Freeman filed by Defendant Zachary Freeman re #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed), #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Crittenden, William)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE, by Defendant Zachary Freeman, to #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed), #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Crittenden, William)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Perry M. Tapper filed by Defendant University of Washington re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Garland, Nancy)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Garland, Nancy)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Jeff Trissell filed by Defendant David Daleiden re #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed). (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DISREGARD THIS FILING, INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED PER COUNSEL. CORRECTLY FILED AS #43 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Daleiden, to #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed). (Schrempp, Theresa) Modified on 8/15/2016 (PS).
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE, by Defendant University of Washington, to #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed). (Garland, Nancy)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #38 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Michael Trissell for David Daleiden, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #42 Response to Motion, : DISREGARD THIS FILING, INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED PER COUNSEL. CORRECTLY FILED AS #43 (PS)
August 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William John Crittenden on behalf of Defendant Zachary Freeman. (Crittenden, William)
August 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey M. Trissell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant David Daleiden (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4563322 (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendant David Daleiden. (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of David B. Edwards filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) (Edwards, David)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/16/2016, (Edwards, David)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy S Garland on behalf of Defendant University of Washington. (Garland, Nancy)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Karin L. Nyrop, on behalf of University of Washington, on 8/4/2016. (Bowman, Jill)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant David Daleiden mailed on 8/5/2016 (Bowman, Jill)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zachary Freeman on 8/4/2016, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Power, Vanessa)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Breen for David Daleiden, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas Brejcha for David Daleiden, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibits A and B re #7 Declaration by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting Plaintiffs' #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and RESTRAINING the University of Washington from releasing, altering, or disposing of the requested documents or disclosing the personal identifying information of Plaintiffs pending further order of this court. Unless the court orders otherwise, the TRO expires 14 days from the date of this order at 11:59 p.m. Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is RENOTED for 8/19/2016. Plaintiffs to serve Defendants no later than 8/5/2016 and file proof of service. (PM)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Breen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant David Daleiden (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4550644 (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant David Daleiden (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4550609 (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Theresa Ann Schrempp on behalf of Defendant David Daleiden. (Schrempp, Theresa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman, University of Washington, filed by John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10.(Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman, University of Washington, filed by John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10.(Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRAECIPE to attach document (Exhibits A - F) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. Noting Date 8/26/2016, (Power, Vanessa) Modified on 8/3/2016 motion is renoted only to the preliminary injunction portion of the motion (AD).
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Janet Chung filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jill Bowman filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of David Edwards filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #16 MOTION to Certify Class (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/26/2016, (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION Proceed in Pseudonym by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman, University of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 8 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 7 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 6 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 5 filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 4 filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 3 filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 2 filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of John Doe 1 filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Vanessa Power filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of Connie Cantrell filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Ellen Gertzog filed by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Jane and John 1-10 Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2016, (Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) David Daleiden, Zachary Freeman, University of Washington (Receipt # 0981-4549243) Attorney Vanessa Soriano Power added to party Jane and John 1-10 Doe(pty:pla), filed by Jane and John 1-10 Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Power, Vanessa)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (ST)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #20 Notice of Motion Re-Noted: The motion at dkt. #2 is renoted only to the preliminary injunction portion of the motion. (AD)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, John and Jane Does must entered as separate parties. For example, one party would be entered as John Does 1-10 and the other would be Jane Does 1-10. The docket has now been corrected. Thank you. (ST)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order **DISREGARD** Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST) Modified on 8/3/2016 (ST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Does 1-10 et al v. University of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Does 1-10
Represented By: Jill Diane Bowman
Represented By: David B Edwards
Represented By: Janet S Chung
Represented By: Lauren Wigginton
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Represented By: Sara Ainsworth
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Kim Christensen Clark
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: KC Lynne Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Jill Diane Bowman
Represented By: David B Edwards
Represented By: Janet S Chung
Represented By: Lauren Wigginton
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Represented By: Sara Ainsworth
Represented By: Kim Christensen Clark
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: KC Lynne Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Washington
Represented By: John R Nicholson
Represented By: Nancy S Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Thomas Brejcha
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Trissell
Represented By: Peter Breen
Represented By: Theresa Ann Schrempp
Represented By: William John Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Freeman
Represented By: William John Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Tapper
Represented By: Nancy S Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?