Diversified Lenders, LLC v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diversified Lenders, LLC
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Vertical Holdings Unlimited, LLC
Cross_claimant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Vertical Holdings Unlimited, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01232
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting Cross-Claim Plaintiff Amazon Logistics, Inc's 130 Motion for Default Judgment against Cross-Claim Defendant Vertical Holdings Unlimited, LLC. Amazon is awarded damages in the amount of $296,906 on its cross-claims against VHU. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against Amazon Logistics, Inc.; striking, without prejudice, as moot Cross Claimant/Defendant Amazon's 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; re parties' 127 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, as to Diversified, within seven days of the date of this Order, why sanctions, up to and including dismissal of its claims, should not be imposed; re defendant Amazon Logistics, Inc's 103 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES: Bench Trial (2-3 days) is set for 3/5/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motions in Limine due by 2/5/2018, Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/28/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/28/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 93 Motion for a continuance of the case management deadlines. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a revised case management order which provides at least thirty days between that date and the dispositive motion deadline. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Completion of Depositions Outside Discovery Cutoff re parties' 96 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying plaintiff's 81 Motion to Compel Defendant Amazon Logistics, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs Third Set of Requests for Production and Third Set of Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Defendant Amazon Logistics, Inc. 's 84 Motion to Amend Answer; Defendant may, within seven of the date of this Order, file an amended answer in substantially the form of Dkt. # 84 , signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part Diversified's 63 Motion for Protective Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diversified Lenders, LLC v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversified Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertical Holdings Unlimited, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Vertical Holdings Unlimited, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?