Brown v. King County
Plaintiff: Claude Brown
Defendant: King County
Case Number: 2:2016cv01340
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 COURT'S JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 113 objections to the Court's proposed set of jury instructions. The Court has attached to this Minute Order its revised proposed verdict form; The Court will hold a conference during trial with regard to the proposed jury instructions and verdict form, and any objections thereto, before entering the Court's final jury instructions and verdict form. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER: The first day of trial, Monday, June 14, 2021, is hereby RESCHEDULED to begin at 9:00 a.m., rather than 1:00 p.m., and will end at 4:00 p.m. On the first day of trial, after jury selection, the parties should be prepared to proceed with opening statements and Plaintiff should be prepared to have witnesses available to testify. The trial schedule will otherwise proceed as indicated at the pretrial conference. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING in part and DEFERRING in part Plaintiff's 91 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER: The Court AMENDS the case schedule, see Minute Order (docket no. 80 ), to the extent that the Court will propose a draft set of voir dire and jury instructions on or before May 14, 2021, and any objections to the Court's draft set of voir dire and jury instructions shall be due by May 28, 2021. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES AND PROTOCOLS FOR VIRTUAL JURY TRIAL. All counsel who will actively participate in trial, as well as their assistants, shall attend a technology check session with the Courts law clerk and courtroom deputy clerk on June 2, 2021 , at 3:00 p.m. The Pretrial Conference remains scheduled for June 4, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Both the technology check session and the Pretrial Conference will be conducted via ZoomGov. Counsel will be provided links via email. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER: On March 19, 2021, the Court entered General Order 04-21, continuing nearly all civil and criminal in-person trials scheduled to occur before June 30, 2021. The parties are therefore ORDERED to show cause why this Court should not re quire that this six-day jury trial, which is scheduled to begin on June 14, 2021, be conducted virtually over any party's objection. The parties shall file their show-cause response, not to exceed four (4) pages in length, on or before Friday, April 16, 2021. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER: Jury Trial (6 days) is set for 6/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions related to expert witnesses due by 4/1/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/13/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/28/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report by 10/2/2020 indicating the following: a. The status of the case; b. The proposed trial date and time necessary to try the case; c. Whether the parties would agree to a bench trial; and d. Whether the parties would agree to a remote jury trial using Zoom. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Defendant's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; Brown's claims against Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 55 Stipulation Staying Trial Deadlines; The current trial date and pretrial deadlines, including those set forth in 24 Minute Order, are hereby STRICKEN. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 46 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Depose Plaintiff on Multiple Claims, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 23 Stipulation ; the following dates and deadlines are CONTINUED as indicated: Jury Trial is set for 3/12/2018 ; Motions due by 8/24/2017, Discovery completed by 10/3/2017, Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2017, Motions in Limine due by 2/8/2018, Pretrial Order due by 2/23/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 02:00 PM, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/23/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Brown
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Erin L. Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?