Killam v. Seattle Center Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Addie Killam
Defendant: Seattle Center Corporation, Pacific Northwest Ballet Association and Seattle Opera
Case Number: 2:2016cv01455
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having telephonically advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without co sts. The trial date of June 10, 2019, and all related dates and deadlines are STRICKEN. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying defendants Ticket Master, LLC and Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.'s 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to claims against defendant AEG Presents NW, LLC re parties' 46 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (AEG Presents NW, LLC terminated.)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulated Motion as follows: Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend pleading; Plaintiff shall file amended pleading on or before 3/26/2018; Bench trial date of 11/13/2018 and all related dates and deadlines are STRICKEN; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/18/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/2/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date: **Bench Trial (4-5 days) is set for 11/13/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/12/2018, M otions due by 5/10/2018, Discovery completed by 6/15/2018, Dispositive motions due by 7/19/2018, Motions in Limine due by 10/11/2018, Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/26/2018, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 10/26/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killam v. Seattle Center Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addie Killam
Represented By: Christopher Robert Carney
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Center Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Northwest Ballet Association
Represented By: Bruce Michael Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Opera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?