Lake et al v. MTC Financial Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wayne R Lake and Cynthia A Lake
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01482
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendant Deutsche Bank's 18 Motion to dismiss, denying leave to amend the first amended complaint, and dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against RTSC in their entirety. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via the USPS
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendant Deutsche Bank's 8 motion to dismiss; granting the Lakes leave to amend their complaint with respect to their FDCPA claim and denying the Lakes leave to amend their contract claim. Amended complaint due within 20 days of this order. The Lakes are ordered to SHOW CAUSE within 20 days why their claims against RTSC should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m). The Lakes should file their amended complaint, if any, and response to the court's order to show cause separately. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via the USPS
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Appearance and Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia A Lake, Wayne R Lake; by Judge James L. Robart.(RM) Copy mailed to Cynthia Lake & Wayne Lake.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake et al v. MTC Financial Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne R Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc
Represented By: Michael Steven DeLeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?