Zermeno v. North Pacific Fishing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Zermeno
Defendant: North Pacific Fishing Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01540
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 37 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re parties' 33 Stipulation; the first amended complaint filed on November 13, 2017 (Dkt. # 32 ), is now the operative pleading, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Amend to Waive Jury Demand; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint substantially in the form of Exhibit A to his motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zermeno v. North Pacific Fishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Zermeno
Represented By: Christopher Michael Davis
Represented By: Dennis M O'Bryan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Pacific Fishing Inc
Represented By: Louis A Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?