Laigo v. King County, et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Andrew Laigo, III
Defendant: Sagi, Custody Officers, Transport Officers, Supervisors, Jail Health Services Nurses and Providers and King County
Case Number: 2:2016cv01541
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER ADOPTING 163 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting defendants' 155 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims and his 78 , 79 Amended Complaint; denying plaintiff's request to set this matter for trial. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting defendants' 150 Motion for Extension of Time; denying plaintiff's 152 Motion to Include Additional Evidence; Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2018, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying plaintiff's 132 Motion to Bifurcate Trial re 136 Motion for Order; denying defendants' 134 Motion to Strike or Dismiss, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's 129 Motion for Service by Marshals, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE to the thirty-nine individual defendants by 1st Class Mail re 79 Amended Complaint; mailed on 2/16/2018; striking discovery and dispositive motion deadlines, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: # 1 General Order) (cc: King County Prosecutor's Office via first-class mail) **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 56 Motion for Reconsideration; granting plaintiff's 75 Motion for Leave to Amend to Identify Doe Defendants; modifying deferred portions of 65 Report and Recommendations; striking King County's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; REFERRING back to Magistrate Judge Theiler for further proceedings, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Report & Recommendation 65 is a ADOPTED in part, MODIFIED in part, and DEFERRED in part. Plaintiff's renewed motion for appointment of counsel, docket no. 56 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's reply, doc ket no. 56 , is treated as a motion for reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Theiler's Order denying plaintiff's motion to compel discovery, docket no. 53 , and King County is DIRECTED to file a response by October 27, 2017. The R&R is RENOTED to October 27, 2017. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632) (PM)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying plaintiff's 36 Motion to Compel; denying plaintiff's 38 Motion to Amend. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(GB)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting the 31 Report and Recommendation; granting defendant Henry C. Sagi, M.D.'s motion for summary judgment 23 . Plaintiff's claims against defendant Sagi are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632) (PM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler granting in part Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. As related to all remaining defendants other than Dr. Sagi, the discovery deadline is hereby extended to May 31, 2017, and the dispositive motion filing deadline is extended to June 30, 2017. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Benjamin Laigo, Prisoner ID: 936632)(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laigo v. King County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Andrew Laigo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagi
Represented By: Andrew G Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custody Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Health Services Nurses and Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?