Job's Daughters International v. Yoast
Plaintiff: Job's Daughters International
Defendant: Heidi Yoast
Case Number: 2:2016cv01573
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Appointing United States Magistrate Judge James P. Donohue as Settlement Judge signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying defendant Heidi Yoast's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Counter Defendants Job's Daughters International, Rod Reid's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaims. Any claim for attorney's fees arising from counterclaims is also dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Counter Defendant Shelly Cole's 32 Motion to Dismiss; for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Shelly Cole terminated.)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendant's 34 Motion to Substitute Attorney, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Added attorney Tracey V Munger for Heidi Yoast. Attorney John B Crosetto terminated)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying defendant's 20 Motion to Substitute Attorney as Ms Groves is not admitted to practice in this district signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Counterclaims, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Job's Daughters International v. Yoast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Job's Daughters International
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Velloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Yoast
Represented By: John B Crosetto
Represented By: Emily DeBow-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?