Umouyo v. Bank of America, NA et al
Plaintiff: Henry A. Umouyo
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and Any Unknown Persons or Unknown Spouses Claiming by, through, and under Bank of America, NA
Case Number: 2:2016cv01576
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 67 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s 60 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Compel Bank of America to Produce Documents signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s 41 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant may file its responsive pleading no later than seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER terminating Plaintiff's pending 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment, which Plaintiff may refile after he properly serves BANA. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to serve BANA within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Alternatively, the parties may stipulate to service and file such a stipulation with the Court. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying plaintiff's 10 Motion to Remand; denying plaintiff's 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umouyo v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A. Umouyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Frederick B Rivera
Represented By: Tina R. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Persons or Unknown Spouses Claiming by, through, and under Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?