Gilmore v. Boeing Company

Plaintiff: Michael Gilmore
Defendant: Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01617
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety and denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in its entirety. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 2, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Seal. Exhibit AA 65 to the Declaration of Elizabeth Hanley Supporting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal is hereby sealed. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 22, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re-noting Defendant's 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment to 1/12/2018. Plaintiff's response due 1/8/2018, Defendant's reply due 1/12/2018. Defendant's second and third praecipes (Dkt. Nos. 40 and 45 ) are order ed SEALED forthwith. Defendant to remit within 10 days to Plaintiff's counsel the sum of $3600 as compensation for the time expended to address the filing errors which led to the December 22 phone conference. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 18, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 31 Motion to Compel and to Extend Rebuttal Report Deadline. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
December 7, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Joint Stipulated Motion to Re-Note Defendant's 31 MOTION and to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadline. Defendant's 31 Motion to Compel Rebuttal Expert Interview is re-noted for 12/15/2017. Defendant's propos ed vocational and damages rebuttal expert, Lee E. Miller, is permitted to disclose his expert report on December 22, 2017, or, in the alternative, on the date ordered by the Court if it grants Defendant's Motion to Compel Rebuttal Expert Interview (Dkt. 31 ). Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 26, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Compel Answers and Responses signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 24, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULALTED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting 13 stipulated motion for protective order. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gilmore
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?