Hartley et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robin D Hartley and Tracy Hartley
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., CWMBS, Inc., CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2006-8, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., Ditech Financial LLC, First Magnus Financial Corporation, Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Corporate John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv01640
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting parties' 71 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Complaint, Counterclaim, and Cross-claim. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & RELATED DATES re parties' 69 Stipulated Motion: Jury Trial is set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Length of trial: 10 days. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2 ) due by 7/11/2018, Discovery completed by 9/9/2018, Dispositive motions due by 10/9/2018, Motions in Limine due by 12/10/2018, Pretrial Order due by 12/26/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 9/23/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/2/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/2/2019, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 66 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. and Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Northwest Trustee Services, Inc. and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. terminated.)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Stipulated Joint Motion for Continuance of Trial and Related Deadlines, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The clerk shall issue an amended case schedule. (KERR)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice re parties' 60 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Bank of America, N.A. terminated.)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s 20 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik granting in part and denying in part Defendant NWTS' 16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' quiet title, MLHA, good faith and fair dealing, and emotional distress claims are dismissed as to this defendant. Plaintiffs' negligence claim may proceed. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin D Hartley
Represented By: Christopher M. Edwards
Represented By: Douglas A Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hartley
Represented By: Christopher M. Edwards
Represented By: Douglas A Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Michael J Kapaun
Represented By: Peter J Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWMBS, Inc., CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2006-8
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Michael J Kapaun
Represented By: Peter J Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Peter J Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Magnus Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Michael J Kapaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?