Kitazi v. Sellen Construction Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eric Kitazi
Defendant: Sellen Construction Company Inc, Robert P McCleskey, Jane Doe McCleskey, Kate Harkess and Ken Knudsen
Case Number: 2:2016cv01651
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Attorneys' Fees in the amount of $148,422.50. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying Defendant's 86 Motion for Remittitur. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting Defendants' 59 -1 64 Amended Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting defendants' Motions to Strike (dkt. ## 32 , 35 ); denying Defendant Sellen's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendants Kate Harkess and Ken Knudsen's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; This case will proceed to trial on all claims against Defendant Sellen. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SWT) (Kate Harkess and Ken Knudsen terminated.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, Various Causes of Action from Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief 29 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(lp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitazi v. Sellen Construction Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kitazi
Represented By: Beverly G Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellen Construction Company Inc
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P McCleskey
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe McCleskey
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Harkess
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Knudsen
Represented By: Kristina Markosova
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?