Canty v. King County et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Lydell Canty
Defendant: King County, Seattle Police Department, City of Seattle and State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2016cv01655
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER ADOPTING 157 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motions to dismiss this action as a discovery sanction (Dkts. 121 , 123 ) are GRANTED. Plaintiff's second amended complaint (Dkt. 38 ) and this action are DISMISSED, with prejudice, for failure of plaintiff to comply with the rules of discovery as set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSIONS AND RE-NOTING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Plaintiff's submissions received since September 15, 2017 which are not incompliance with the Court's Prisoner E-Filing Initiative (Dkts. 117 , 118 , 119 , [1 20], 127 , 128 , 131 , 134 , 135 , 136 , 137 , 138 , 139 , 140 , 141 , 142 , and 143 ) are STRICKEN. Any subsequent non-complying submissions will be stricken as well. Defendants' dispositive motions (Dkts. 121 and 123 ) are RE-N OTED on the Court's calendar for consideration on December 1, 2017. Plaintiff is directed to file any response to defendants' pending dispositive motions not later than November 27, 2017. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyle Canty, Prisoner ID: 401358) (TH)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Suppress Evidence of a Bench Trial Guilty Verdict Not Pertaining to 16-1-03103-6 SEA ; striking Plaintiff's 80 Motion and Notice of Policies and Procedures Pursuant to Civil Commitment ; strikin g Plaintiff's 82 Emergency Motion pursuant to qualified immunity plaintiff's response to all defendants ; denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion pursuant to question of law ; denying Plaintiff's 86 Motion pursuant to 6th amend righ ts violations ; striking Plaintiff's 102 Motion pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997d Prohibition of Retaliation ; denying Plaintiff's 103 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying Plaintiff's 104 Motion Pursuant to Access to the Law, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyle Canty, Prisoner ID: 401358)(SWT)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER adopting 84 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. 49 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyle Canty, Prisoner ID: 401358) (TH)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall explain to the Court in writing, not later than September 28, 2017, why he is failing to comply with the mandatory E-Filing Initiative. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyle Canty, Prisoner ID: 401358) (TH)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue. Discovery completed by 11/13/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/13/2017. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER STRIKING/DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS AND STRIKING IMPROPER SUBMISSIONS re 61 62 63 69 70 76 signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS) cc plaintiff
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion Pursuant to LCR 6(a) Computing and Extending Time; denying Plaintiff's 48 Motion Pursuant to LCR 5.2(a) Redaction of Filings; and striking Plaintiff's 53 Motion and Declaration of Defendants Motive and Retaliation. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Directing Response to Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Injunctive Relief ; directing defendants to file a response to the motion no later than 7/31/2017 ; Plaintiff may file a reply brief in support of his motion not later than 8/4/2017 ; Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief NOTED for 8/4/2017, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT to City of Seattle; King County by Hon. James P. Donohue. Packet placed in US Marshal's mailbox on 6/13/2017. (cc: plaintiff; Seattle City Attorney's Office; King County Prosecutor's Office)(ST)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON REVIEW OF REQUEST TO RECUSE by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The Court finds no evidence upon which to reasonably question Judge Donohue's impartiality and AFFIRMS his denial of Plaintiff's requests that he recuse himself. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canty v. King County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Lydell Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?